EP1830092 - Device for synchronization and engagement of a gear change of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELASIS - Società Consortile per Azioni Via Ex Aeroporto, S.N. 80038 Pomigliano d'Arco / IT | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Martino, Alessandro c/o Elasis Società Consortile per Azioni Via Ex Aeroporto S/N 80038 Pomigliano d'Arco / IT | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425138.2 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830092 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830092 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06, F16H63/30 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F16D23/06 (EP,US);
F16H63/30 (EP,US);
F16H63/3013 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Synchronisierung und Einschaltung für ein Fahrzeugschaltgetriebe | [2007/36] | English: | Device for synchronization and engagement of a gear change of a motor vehicle | [2007/36] | French: | Dispositif de synchronisation et de crabotage d'une boîte de vitesse d'automobile | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.09.2009 | BE | 09.09.2009 | BG | 09.09.2009 | CY | 09.09.2009 | CZ | 09.09.2009 | DK | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | FI | 09.09.2009 | LT | 09.09.2009 | LV | 09.09.2009 | NL | 09.09.2009 | PL | 09.09.2009 | RO | 09.09.2009 | SE | 09.09.2009 | SI | 09.09.2009 | TR | 09.09.2009 | GR | 10.12.2009 | ES | 20.12.2009 | IS | 09.01.2010 | PT | 11.01.2010 | GB | 02.03.2010 | IE | 02.03.2010 | LU | 02.03.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
LU | 02.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
HU | 10.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
BG | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
GB | 02.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
IE | 02.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
GR | 10.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
DK | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.09.2009 | |
BE | 09.09.2009 | ||
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 09.09.2009 | |
CY | 09.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
CZ | 09.09.2009 | ||
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
RO | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
IS | 09.01.2010 | ||
PT | 11.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
ES | 20.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
FI | 09.09.2009 | ||
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 09.09.2009 | |
LT | 09.09.2009 | ||
LV | 09.09.2009 | ||
NL | 09.09.2009 | ||
PL | 09.09.2009 | ||
SE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SI | 09.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE318115 (F. BRUNNER) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]BE657127 (A. VINCI, O. ZECCHINEL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4324264 (BARTOS STANISLAV FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US2004007084 (LANZ HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1,19,21 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005036007 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2862366 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,19,21 * the whole document * | Examination | DE4325964 | DE10206584 | US6993991 |