EP1852398 - Method and apparatus for the treatment with electric current of polluted fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Antomag s.r.l. Corso Lodi 34 20135 Milano (MI) / IT | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Antomag s.r.l. Via G. G. Belli snc 00053 Civitavecchia (RM) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boschi, Cristiano Località Zoccolanti 5 06010 Citerna (PG) / IT | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | Concone, Emanuele, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425152.3 | 08.03.2006 | [2007/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1852398 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1852398 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/46, C02F1/48, A61L2/03, A23L3/32 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A61L2/03 (EP);
A23L3/005 (EP);
A23L3/32 (EP);
A61L2/24 (EP);
C02F1/4608 (EP);
C02F2201/46125 (EP);
C02F2201/46145 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/03 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Behandlung beschmutzter Flüssigkeiten mittels eines elektrischen Stroms | [2008/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for the treatment with electric current of polluted fluids | [2007/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositifs de traitement de fluides pollués par par un courant électrique | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/45] | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Behandlung beschmutzter Flüssigkeiten mittels eines elektrischen Stroms 990/15] mit elektrischem Strom | Examination procedure | 05.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | LT | 01.07.2009 | LV | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | IE | 08.03.2010 | LU | 08.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 08.03.2010 | ||
LU | 08.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
IE | 08.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 08.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 08.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
LT | 01.07.2009 | ||
LV | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3766050 (PADOS I) [X] 7 * column 5, line 14 - column 8, line 26; example 1 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 28; figures 1,10 * [A] 8-10; | [XA]US4169029 (SMIRNOV OLEG V, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 2; examples 1-18; claim 1 * [A] 3-10; | [A]EP0553377 (IIT RES INST [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 15; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US5326530 (BRIDGES JACK E [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 5 - line 24 * * column 6, lines 1-19 *; | [A]EP1000554 (INST VOOR AGROTECH ONDERZOEK [NL]) [A] * column 4, line 55 - line 60; figures 3,4 * |