EP1855379 - Output power control of an RF amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vaiana, Michele Parco Europa, 43 95047 Paterno / IT | 02 /
Gramegna, Giuseppe Piazza Dei Martiri, 31 95131 Catania / IT | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Avegno, 6 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425321.4 | 12.05.2006 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855379 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855379 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H03F1/0261 (EP,US);
H03F1/302 (EP,US);
H03F2200/18 (EP,US);
H03F2200/447 (EP,US);
H03F2200/456 (EP,US);
H03F2200/462 (EP,US);
H03F2200/78 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/30] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ausgangsleistungskontrolle eines Hochfrequenzverstärkers | [2007/46] | English: | Output power control of an RF amplifier | [2007/46] | French: | Commande de puissance de sortie d'un amplificateur haute fréquence | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.02.2011 | [2012/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0609053 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0942524 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6271695 (GRAMEGNA GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [AD] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US6304108 (INN BRUCE LEE [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 54; figure 3 *; | [A]US2002024390 (YAMASHITA KIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0033]; figure 8 *; | [A]EP1326328 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0057]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2004056721 (LESAGE STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2005068107 (BACHHUBER STEPHEN P [US], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD] - JARVINEN, E.; KALAJO, S.; MATILAINEN, M., "Bias circuits for GaAs HBT power amplifiers", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 2001 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL, Phoenix , AZ, (20010520), vol. 1, pages 507 - 510, XP002405191 [AD] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2001.966942 |