EP1881505 - Memory device with embedded microprocessor for autonomously searching and repairing failures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via Olivetti 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mondello, Antonino Via Comunale Santo, 370/A 98148 Messina / IT | 02 /
Tumminia, Alessandro Via Nebrodi, 30 95123 Catania / IT | 03 /
Buono, Luigi Via Malerba, 6 95030 Gravina di Catania / IT | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Jürgen Helmut, et al Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Kraus, Jürgen Helmut, et al Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Pellegri, Alberto Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Avegno, 6 21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425503.7 | 20.07.2006 | [2008/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881505 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/16, G11C29/00 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
G11C29/48 (EP,US);
G11C29/16 (EP,US);
G11C29/4401 (EP,US);
G11C29/82 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/40] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speicher mit eingebauter Microprozessor zur selbstständigen Fehlersuche und Behebung | [2008/04] | English: | Memory device with embedded microprocessor for autonomously searching and repairing failures | [2008/04] | French: | Mémoire avec microprocesseur intégré pour la détection et la réparation autonome d'erreurs | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 24.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002001241 (HOTAKA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 3* abstract *; | [X]EP1453062 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005034040 |