EP1882497 - Exercise bench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unione Consulenti Srl Via San Luca 10 20122 Milano / IT | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nocco, Alessandro Piazza G. Falcone 9 20090 Opera (MI) / IT | [2008/05] | Application number, filing date | 06425541.7 | 28.07.2006 | [2008/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1882497 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63B23/00 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
A63B23/00 (EP);
A63B23/0211 (EP);
A63B23/0233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT [2008/41] |
Former [2008/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Übungsbank | [2008/05] | English: | Exercise bench | [2008/05] | French: | Banc d'exercise | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4546967 (KECALA IHOR G [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 20 - column 7, line 33; figures 1-20 *; | [X]WO9740892 (LICHTENSTEIN GARY [IL]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5779606 (CHEN CHIN-JUNG [TW]) [X] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]US5997450 (WILKINSON WILLIAM T [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE20006823U (CHEN SAN HUEI [TW], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |