EP1906155 - Speed indicating instrument for a motor-vehicle provided with an adaptive cruise control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 - Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Repetto, Piermario Via Sismonda, 10/6 10145 Torino / IT | 02 /
Bernard, Stefano c/o C.R.F. Societa Consortile Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Notaro, Giancarlo c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2008/14] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.r.l. Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425664.7 | 27.09.2006 | [2008/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906155 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906155 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/28, G01D7/06 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G01D11/28 (EP,US);
B60K31/042 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/215 (EP,US);
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
G01D7/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitsanzeige für ein Fahrzeug ausgestattet mit einem adaptiven Geschwindigkeitsregelsystem | [2008/14] | English: | Speed indicating instrument for a motor-vehicle provided with an adaptive cruise control system | [2008/14] | French: | Indicateur de vitesse pour un véhicule équipé avec un système de commande de vitesse adaptatif | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 19.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.2009 | BE | 07.01.2009 | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | LT | 07.01.2009 | LV | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | PL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | SE | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | ES | 18.04.2009 | IS | 07.05.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | IE | 27.09.2009 | LU | 27.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
IE | 27.09.2009 | ||
LU | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.09.2009 | ||
LU | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 07.01.2009 | |
BE | 07.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2009 | ||
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB810224 (GEN MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 14; figures 1-6; claim 1 * * page 5, lines 1-7 *; | [A]WO0192047 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]DE20213491U (KERSCHER PETER [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |