EP1925713 - Laundry drier with an additional controlled-temperature compartment for delicate laundry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano Via Grigna 2 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425798.3 | 24.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925713 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925713 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24, D06F58/10 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
D06F58/10 (EP,US);
D06F58/48 (EP,US);
D06F58/02 (EP,US);
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner mit zusätzlicher Kammer mit Temperaturkontrolle für Feinwäsche | [2008/22] | English: | Laundry drier with an additional controlled-temperature compartment for delicate laundry | [2008/22] | French: | Séchoir à linge doté d'un compartiment supplémentaire à température contrôlée pour le linge délicat | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1408151 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0025] - [0030] - [0032] - [0044] - [0048] , [0051]; figure -; claims 1,12-15 *; | [A]EP1541744 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]EP1591579 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE102005053702 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0037] - [0046] - [0078] - [0081]; figure -; claim - * |