EP1820695 - Control system for automotive display devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magneti Marelli Sistemi Elettronici S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti 61/63 20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mortara, Piero, Magneti Marelli Sistemi Elet. SPA Viale Carlo Emanuele II, 118 10078 Venaria Reale / IT | 02 /
De La Pierre, Piero Magneti Marelli Sis. Elet. SPA Viale Carlo Emanuele II, 118 10078 Venaria Reale / IT | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425830.4 | 12.12.2006 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | EP20060425088 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06425088 | [2007/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820695 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1820695 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/04 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP,US);
B60K2360/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/31] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungssystem für Anzeigevorrichtungen von Fahrzeugen | [2007/34] | English: | Control system for automotive display devices | [2007/34] | French: | Système de contrôle pour dispositifs d'affichage automobile | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 23.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 10.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19539799 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, lines 6-21 ** page 2, line 15; claims 1,8 *; | [X]DE19940718 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 2, lines 39-57 * * column 3, lines 4-12 * * column 3, lines 39-44 * * column 4, lines 44-56 * * column 7, lines 23-28; claims 1,2,12,13 *; | [X]WO0183263 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 49; claims 1,3,4,7 * |