Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7862048 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2011 | B2 | US2010084821 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96138907 | 20.12.2007 | US63188209 | 07.12.2009 | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7654537 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2010 | B2 | US2008157480 | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1939414 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2013 | B1 | EP1939414 | 02.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0801841 | 14.09.2021 | B8 | BRPI0801841 | 26.01.2021 | B1 | BRPI0801841 | 31.03.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2615331 | 12.06.2012 | C | CA2615331 | 29.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007016559 | 16.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06425889 | 29.12.2006 |