EP1693050 - Care product for skin and/or hair, and the use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2011/35] | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states Sara Lee/DE N.V. Keulsekade 143 3532 AA Utrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamidane, Fatima Zahra Hubrechtplein 2 2351 SB Leiderdorp / NL | 02 /
Lambers, Hans Mient 407 2564 LB Den Haag / NL | 03 /
Landa, Andrew Sjaak Oostwijk 6 3461 GP Linschoten / NL | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Acham, Nicholas Clive, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Acham, Nicholas Clive, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/42] | Michalík, Andrej, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2006/34] | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq Brants & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06447018.0 | 31.01.2006 | [2006/34] | Priority number, date | NL20051028164 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: NL 1028164 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693050 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693050 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61K8/63, A61K8/92, A61Q19/00, A61Q5/00 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
A61Q19/007 (EP);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/63 (EP);
A61K8/925 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q5/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Title | German: | Pflegemittel für Haut und Haare und Verwendung | [2006/34] | English: | Care product for skin and/or hair, and the use thereof | [2006/34] | French: | Composition de soin de la peau et des cheveux, et utilisation | [2006/34] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2011 | 11.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2006 | AT | 11.07.2012 | BE | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | CH | 31.01.2013 | IE | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | LU | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
IE | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
BE | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4760096 (SAKAI KIRK [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * claim 1 * * column 3, line 32 - line 41 * * column 4, line 36 - line 47 * * example III *; | [X]US6153209 (VEGA VICTOR NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 13, line 18 - line 40 * * column 17, line 45 - line 59 * * column 18, line 24 - line 34 * * column 19, line 42 - line 47 * * column 25, line 16 - line 31 * * examples 3-5 *; | [A] - CRODA INC., SUPER STEROL ESTER, (19940817), URL: http://crodausa.com/datasheets/Super_Sterol_Ester_DS-63.pdf, (20060614), XP002386017 [A] 1-18 * page 2 * | Examination | US3745033 | - RIT A.W.P. ET AL, "A NEW BEESWAX DERIVATIVE FOR COSMETIC FORMULATIONS", COSMETICS & TOILETRIES, WHEATON, IL, US, (19900801), vol. 105, no. 8, ISSN 0361-4387, pages 53 - 56,58, XP009016494 | by applicant | WO03092646 |