EP1749937 - Covering for protection of switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAE EISENBAHNSYSTEME GMBH Alpinestrasse 1 8740 Zeltweg / AT | For all designated states VAE GmbH Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leitner, Josef Farch 79 8741 Weisskirchen / AT | 02 /
Schreibmaier, Mario Rachau 63 8720 Knittelfeld / AT | 03 /
Stornig, Gerald Ulmenweg 18 8740 Möbersdorfsiedlung / AT | 04 /
Leitner, Friedrich Dorfstrasse 48 8734 Kleinlobming / AT | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/06] | Haffner, Thomas M. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06450105.9 | 25.07.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | AT20050000525U | 02.08.2005 Original published format: AT 5252005 U | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749937 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1749937 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E01B7/20 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
E01B7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Extension states | RS | 18.07.2007 | Title | German: | Abdeckung für Antriebs-, Verschluss- und/oder Prüfergestänge eines Weichenantriebs | [2007/06] | English: | Covering for protection of switches | [2007/06] | French: | Recouvrement d'un aiguillage pour voie ferrée | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 15.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | LU | 25.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/22] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
LU | 25.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | DK | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1724778 (RAILWAY TRANSPORT INST [SU]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19623286 (SCHWIHAG GMBH [CH]) [DA] 1-3,5,8 * figures 1,2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP1136622 (GMUNDNER FERTIGTEILE GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-3,5,8 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [DA]NL1017746C (WISSELBOUW NEDERLAND B V [NL]) [DA] 1,2,4 * figures 2,3 * | by applicant | DE19623286 | NL1014443C | NL1017746C |