EP1757859 - Boiler for granular fuel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenzopf, Georg Moosham 19 4816 Gschwandt / AT | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 06450114.1 | 22.08.2006 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | AT20050001393 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: AT 13932005 | [2007/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757859 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757859 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23B40/02, F23B80/04, F23G7/10, F23K3/02, F23K3/14, F23M9/06 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
F23B80/04 (EP);
F23B1/28 (EP);
F23B1/38 (EP);
F23B60/02 (EP);
F23G7/105 (EP);
F23K3/02 (EP);
F23K3/14 (EP);
F23M9/06 (EP);
F23G2205/121 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | Heizkessel für körnige Brennstoffe | [2007/09] | English: | Boiler for granular fuel | [2007/09] | French: | Chaudière à combustible granulaire | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IE | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | DK | 03.11.2010 | |
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | DK | 03.11.2010 | |
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | DK | 03.11.2010 | |
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | EE | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4517903 (RICHMOND IAIN J [CA], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 45; figure 1 *; | [DY]US4528917 (JACOBS CLIFFORD S [US]) [DY] 1-3 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]US4856438 (PEUGH DEAN [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 37 - line 63 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 5; figure 3 *; | [A]DE29912760U (WODTKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph L - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP1416224 (WILDE ANDREAS ING [AT]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 42; figure . *; | [Y] - PADINGER R, "OPTIMIERTE HOLZVERBRENNUNG", BWK BRENNSTOFF WARME KRAFT, SPRINGER VDI VERLAG, DUSSELDORF, DE, (19940701), vol. 46, no. 7/8, ISSN 1618-193X, pages 331 - 333, XP000444886 [Y] 1-3 * page 331, column R, paragraph 2 - page 332, column L, paragraph 4; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE1451574 | US4528917 | EP1416224 |