EP1836383 - START CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-ken. 445-0012 / JP | [2017/11] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-ken. 445-0012 / JP | |||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON SOKEN, INC. 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi Aichi-ken. 445-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEYAMA, Masaki c/o NIPPON SOKEN, INC., 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi, 4450012 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Makoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Minoru c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | 04 /
KUROKI, Rentaro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi, 4718571 / JP | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/11] |
Former [2007/39] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06700477.0 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006JP300410 | Priority number, date | JP20050006312 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005006312 | JP20050295023 | 07.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005295023 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006075726 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1836383 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836383 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02D35/02 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
F02D41/065 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0092 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0095 (EP,US);
F02D35/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/008 (EP,US);
F02D41/009 (EP,US);
F02N11/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/11] |
Former [2008/16] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STARTSTEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2007/39] | English: | START CONTROL APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE DEMARRAGE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | [2018/15] |
Former [2017/50] | ES | 15.03.2017 | Cited in | Examination | JP2001173488 |