EP1846466 - USE OF LOW SWELL. WATER VAPOUR PERMEABLE POLY(URETHANE-UREA)S FOR COATING FABRICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/43] | LOW SWELL. WATER VAPOUR PERMEABLE POLY(URETHANE-UREA)S | ||
[2011/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAXENDEN CHEMICALS LIMITED Paragon Works Baxenden, Near Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOMAX, George Robert, Baxenden Chemicals Ltd. Paragon Works Baxenden NR. Accrington, Lancashire BB52SL / GB | 02 /
EGGINGTON, Noel Thomas, Baxenden Chemicals Ltd. Paragon Works, Baxenden NR. Accrington Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | 03 /
DANES, Rosemary, Baxenden Chemicals Ltd. Paragon Works Baxenden NR. Accrington, Lancashire BB5 2SL / GB | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06700536.3 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006GB00076 | Priority number, date | GB20050000764 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0500764 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006075144 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846466 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846466 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/12, C08G18/48, D06M15/564, D06M15/568, D06M17/10 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
D06M15/564 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4854 (EP,US);
D06M15/568 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3225 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/71 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3225 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/71 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON QUELLUNGSARMEN, WASSERDAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGEN POLY(URETHANHARNSTOFF)EN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON TEXTILIEN | [2011/04] | English: | USE OF LOW SWELL. WATER VAPOUR PERMEABLE POLY(URETHANE-UREA)S FOR COATING FABRICS | [2011/04] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLY(URETHANE-UREE)S FAIBLE GONFLEMENT PERMEABLE(S) A LA VAPEUR D'EAU COMME REVÊTEMENT DE TISSUS | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/43] | QUELLUNGSARME WASSERDAMPFDURCHLÄSSIGE POLY(URETHANHARNSTOFF)E | ||
Former [2007/43] | LOW SWELL. WATER VAPOUR PERMEABLE POLY(URETHANE-UREA)S | ||
Former [2007/43] | POLY(URETHANE-UREE)S FAIBLE GONFLEMENT PERMEABLE(S) A LA VAPEUR D'EAU | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2006 | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | ES | 05.12.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | IE | 11.01.2012 | LU | 11.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LU | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
ES | 05.12.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5239036 (KRISHNAN SUNDARAM [US]) [A] 1-37 * column 6, line 32 - column 6, line 43 * * examples 1,2,8 ** claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0696604 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-8,22-24,27 * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 19 * * examples 1-4 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US5589563 (WARD ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1-13,19,22-24,26-30 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 32 * * column 16, line 55 - column 18, line 29 * * column 22, line 54 - column 26, line 15 * * examples 1,2,5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5756632 (WARD ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * column 18, line 30 - column 23, line 3 * * example 4 * * figure 1 * * claims 6,7 * |