EP1838318 - USE OF OXYCODONE FOR TREATING VISCERAL PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/23] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 122, Boulevard de la Pétrusse 2330 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREWES, Asbjorn Mohr Himmelbjergvej 1, Laven DK-8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Lars Arendt M A Schultz Vej 7 DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Glas, Holger Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Glas, Holger Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06700652.8 | 17.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006EP50252 | Priority number, date | US20050645490P | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 645490 P | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077212 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838318 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838318 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61P25/04, A61K9/20 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP,KR,NO,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP,KR);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | 06.07.2007 | BA | 06.07.2007 | HR | 06.07.2007 | MK | 06.07.2007 | YU | 06.07.2007 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON OXYCODON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VISZERALEM SCHMERZ | [2007/40] | English: | USE OF OXYCODONE FOR TREATING VISCERAL PAIN | [2007/40] | French: | UTILISATION D'OXYCODONE POUR TRAITER LA DOULEUR VISCERALE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2010
04.05.2012
WITHDRAWN Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison, et al, et al Alison Gallafent Ltd 21 Bridge St Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2010
04.05.2012
WITHDRAWN Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison, et al, et al Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB | ||
Former [2010/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.07.2010
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison, et al, et al Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB | 26.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.02.2012 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2012/39] | 07.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2012 | 09.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5656295 (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-19,21-27,32-38 * column 17, lines 1-6; examples 3,4; claim 1 * * column 5, lines 26-61 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, lines 8,51-63 *; | [X]US5945416 (SHANNON HARLAN E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13,21-26,33 * column 5, line 47 * * column 6, lines 57-63 *; | [DA]WO02087512 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [DA] 1-43 * examples 1-5 *; | [DA]EP1449531 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU]) [DA] 1-43 * examples 11-14 *; | [X]US2004254156 (LE BOURDONNEC BERTRAND [US], et al) [X] 1-6,13,21-26,33 * paragraphs [0080] , [0163]; claim 37 *; | [X] - POYHIA R ET AL, "OXYCODONE AND MORPHINE IN POSTOPERATIVE PAIN TREATMENT", PAIN, & SIXTH WORLD CONGRESS ON PAIN, ADELAIDE, SOUTH AUSTRALIA, AUSTRALIA, APRIL 1-6, 1990. PAIN., (1990), no. SUPPL. 5, ISSN 0304-3959, page S143, XP009062727 [X] 1-3,5,6,13,21-23,25,26,33 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-3959(90)92423-N | [PX] - KALSO E, "Oxycodone", JOURNAL OF PAIN AND SYMPTOM MANAGEMENT, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200505), vol. 29, no. 5, ISSN 0885-3924, pages 47 - 56, XP004903891 [PX] 1-7,12-27,32-40 * page S51, column 1, paragraphs 4,5 - page S51, column 2, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpainsymman.2005.01.010 | [A] - CERVERO FERNANDO ET AL, "Visceral pain", LANCET (NORTH AMERICAN EDITION), (19990619), vol. 353, no. 9170, ISSN 0099-5355, pages 2145 - 2148, XP002370469 [A] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(99)01306-9 |