15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
24.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
18.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
15.02.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.02.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
03.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
20.09.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2010 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
14.08.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
14.04.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.12.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
03.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
21.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
18.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
28.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|