EP1846408 - 5-MEMBERED ANNELATED HETEROCYCLIC PYRIMIDINES AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2013/12] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREYNE, Eddy Jean Edgard Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
LACRAMPE, Jean, Fernand, Armand Johnson & Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | 03 /
PERERA, Timothy Pietro Suren Janssen Pharmaceutica Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
TEN HOLTE, Peter Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 05 /
LIGNY, Yannick, Aimé, Eddy Johnson & Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | 06 /
LARDEAU, Delphine, Yvonne Raymonde Johnson&Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | 07 /
LAVRIJSSEN, Tom Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2013/11] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
FREYNE, Eddy Jean Edgard Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | ||
02 /
LACRAMPE, Jean, Fernand, Armand Johnson & Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
PERERA, Timothy Pietro Suren Janssen Pharmaceutica Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
04 /
TEN HOLTE, Peter Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
05 /
LIGNY, Yannick Johnson & Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | |||
06 /
LARDEAU, Delphine Johnson & Johnson BP 615 27106 Val de Reuil Cedex / FR | |||
07 /
LAVRIJSSEN, Tom Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 06700707.0 | 09.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006EP50097 | Priority number, date | EP20050100222 | 14.01.2005 Original published format: EP 05100222 | US20050644767P | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 644767 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006074985 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846408 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846408 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/32, C07D487/04, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, A61P35/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C07D473/32 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | 14.08.2007 | BA | 14.08.2007 | HR | 14.08.2007 | MK | 14.08.2007 | YU | 14.08.2007 | Title | German: | 5-gliedrige annelierte heterocyclische pyrimidine als kinaseinhibitoren | [2012/43] | English: | 5-MEMBERED ANNELATED HETEROCYCLIC PYRIMIDINES AS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2007/43] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE PYRIMIDINE FUSIONNÉ À CINQ BRANCHES COMME INHIBITEUR DE KINASE | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/43] | 5-GLIEDRIGE ANILIERTE HETEROCYCLISCHE PYRIMIDINE ALS KINASEINHIBITOREN | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/38] | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/43] | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 23.04.2010 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2006 | AT | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.01.2006 | |
AT | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BG | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0149688 (UNIVERSITAIRE INSTELLING ANTWE [BE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,14 *; | [DY]EP1147108 (USTAV EX BOTAN AKADEMIE VED CE [CZ]) [DY] 1-12 * the examples *; | [Y]WO2004065378 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * examples 1,2,5-11,15,16 *; | [Y]WO2004094426 (USTAV ORGANICKE CHEMIE A BIOCH [CZ], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 44, line 30 - page 45, line 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004248905 (MARKWALDER JAY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-12* paragraph [0001]; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0153976 | EP0961775 | EP1147108 | EP1244668 | EP1507780 | EP1590341 | - MCLAUGHLIN ET AL., DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY., (2003), vol. 8, pages 793 - 802 | - FISHER ET AL., EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS., (2003), vol. 12, pages 955 - 970 |