01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
04.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
26.08.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
22.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.08.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.05.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
17.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - inventor |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
12.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
20.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.02.2012 |
First examination report |
|
17.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.03.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
20.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
11.04.2008 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
28.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
14.11.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
14.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
12.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.08.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|