Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008118722 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005019708 | 27.01.2005 | JP2005186497 | 27.06.2005 | WO2006JP301385 | 24.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5366398B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JPWO2006080473 | 19.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005019708 | 27.01.2005 | JP2007500616 | 24.01.2006 | JP2005186497 | 27.06.2005 | WO2006JP301385 | 24.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1845072 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2016 | B1 | EP1845072 | 27.04.2011 | A4 | EP1845072 | 17.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005019708 | 27.01.2005 | JP2005186497 | 27.06.2005 | WO2006JP301385 | 24.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100522870C | 05.08.2009 | C | CN101107205 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005019708 | 27.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006080473 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005019708 | 27.01.2005 | JP2005186497 | 27.06.2005 |