EP1845072 - COMPOSITE CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 612-8501 / JP | [2016/39] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 612-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKATA, Kunihide Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4 KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | 02 /
WANG, Yucong Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4 KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | 03 /
SENO, Hiroaki Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4 KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | 04 /
ONITSUKA, Shugo Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4 KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | [2016/20] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
SHIKATA, Kunihide Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4, KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | ||
02 /
WANG, Yucong Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4, KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | |||
03 /
SENO, Hiroaki Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4, KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | |||
04 /
ONITSUKA, Shugo Kyocera Kagoshima R&D Center Patent Section 1-4, KokubuYamashita-cho Kirishima-shi, Kagoshima 8994312 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2014/15] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06701433.2 | 24.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006JP301385 | Priority number, date | JP20050019708 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005019708 | JP20050186497 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005186497 | [2007/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080473 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845072 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845072 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/119, C04B35/488, C04B35/64, C04B35/63, C04B35/645 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
C04B35/119 (EP,US);
C04B35/4885 (EP,US);
C04B35/62685 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
C04B35/6455 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3241 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3275 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3279 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3284 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/442 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/78 (EP,US);
C04B2235/785 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/788 (EP,US);
C04B2235/80 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9661 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | C04B35/119 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/39] |
Former [2008/20] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MISCHKERAMIK UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/42] | English: | COMPOSITE CERAMIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2007/42] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LADITE CÉRAMIQUE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2007 | Translation filed | 08.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.04.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.09.2016 | GB | 24.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/50] | IT | 28.09.2016 | |
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | IT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5002911 (MATSUMOTO ROGER L K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,13 * claims 1,4,10,11 *; | [X]JPH0517210 (SUMITOMO CEMENT CO) [X] 1-7,13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] *; | [X] - SCHMID C ET AL, "The Synthesis of Calcium or Strontium Hexaluminate added ZTA Composite Ceramics", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (19990701), vol. 19, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0955-2219(98)00277-5, ISSN 0955-2219, pages 1741 - 1746, XP004165942 [X] 1-7,13 * page 1742, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1744, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 1745, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-2219(98)00277-5 |