19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
25.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
24.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
05.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
19.02.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
15.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
18.12.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
13.03.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
10.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.06.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
22.02.2008 |
First examination report |
|
20.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
28.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
27.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|