Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009101027 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP00788 | 31.01.2006 | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1848588 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2009 | B1 | EP1848588 | 31.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP00788 | 31.01.2006 | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE428562T | 15.05.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP00788 | 31.01.2006 | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502006003442D1 | 28.05.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP00788 | 31.01.2006 | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006082011 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005006732 | 10.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005006732 | 02.02.2005 |