EP1836225 - KIR-BINDING AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | For all designated states Innate Pharma S.A.S. Immeuble Grand Pré 121, Ancien Chemin de Cassis 13009 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
For all designated states Innate Pharma Immeuble Grand Pré 121, ancien Chemin de Cassis 13009 Marseille / FR | |||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
For all designated states Innate Pharma S.A.S. Immeuble Grand Pré 121, ancien Chemin de Cassis 13009 Marseille / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PADKÆR, Søren, Berg Rosen Allé 2 Hareskov DK-3500 Værløse / DK | 02 /
WAGTMANN, Peter, Andreas, Nicolai, Reumert Vallerød Banevej 34 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | 03 /
SPEE, Pieter Orchidévej 12 DK-3450 Allerød / DK | 04 /
ZAHN, Stefan Byager 23 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 05 /
KJæRGAARD, Kristian Buestræde 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 06 /
Svensson, Anders Roskildevägen 17B S-217 46 Malmö / SE | [2011/44] |
Former [2008/51] | 01 /
PADKÆR, Søren, Berg Rosen Allé 2, Hareskov DK-3500 Værløse / DK | ||
02 /
WAGTMANN, Peter, Andreas, Nicolai, Reumert Vallerød Banevej 34 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | |||
03 /
SPEE, Pieter Orchidévej 12 DK-3450 Allerød / DK | |||
04 /
ZAHN, Stefan Byager 23 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
05 /
KJæRGAARD, Kristian Buestræde 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
06 /
Svensson, Anders Roskildevägen 17B S-217 46 Malmö / SE | |||
Former [2007/39] | 01 /
PADKÆR, Søren, Berg Rosen Allé 2, Hareskov DK-3500 Værløse / DK | ||
02 /
WAGTMANN, Peter, Andreas, Nicolai, Reumert Vallerød Banevej 34 DK-2960 Rungsted Kyst / DK | |||
03 /
SPEE, Pieter Orchidévej 12 DK-3450 Allerød / DK | |||
04 /
ZAHN, Stefan Byager 23 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
05 /
KJæRGAARD, Kristian Buestræde 7 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | Representative(s) | Gallois, Valérie, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Gallois, Valérie, et al Cabinet BECKER & ASSOCIES 25, rue Louis Le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/39] | Nilsson, Karin Norvin Novo Nordisk A/S Corporate Patents Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 06701729.3 | 06.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006EP50073 | Priority number, date | DK20050000021 | 06.01.2005 Original published format: DK 200500021 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006072626 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836225 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1836225 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P31/00, A61P37/00, C12N5/12, C12N15/13 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K2299/00 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | KIR-BINDENDE WIRKSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2007/39] | English: | KIR-BINDING AGENTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2007/39] | French: | AGENTS DE LIAISON KIR ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2006003179 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [E] 1-55* the whole document *; | [X] - MORETTA A ET AL, "A NOVEL SURFACE ANTIGEN EXPRESSED BY A SUBSET OF HUMAN CD3-MINUS CD16-POSITIVE NATURAL KILLER CELLS ROLE IN CELL ACTIVATION AND REGULATION OF CYTOLYTIC FUNCTION", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, TOKYO, JP, (199003), vol. 171, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 695 - 714, XP002309351 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,40,42-45,48,49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.171.3.695 | [X] - V. PASCAL ET AL, "Comparative analysis of NO cell subset distribution in normal and lymphoproliferative disease of granular lymphocyte conditions", EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 34, pages 2930 - 2940, XP002374947 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See Materials and methods (antibodies) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.200425146 | [X] - G. DOROTHEE ET AL, "Functional and molecular characterization of a KIR3DL2/p140 expressing tumor-specific cytotoxic T lymphocyte clone infiltrating a human lung carcinoma", ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 7192 - 7198, XP002374948 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See Materials and methods (mAbs and immunofluorescence analysis) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206627 | [X] - P.K. EPLING-BURNETTE ET AL, "Dysregulated NL receptor expression in patients with lymphoproliferative disease of granular lymphocytes", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, no. 9, pages 3431 - 3439, XP002374949 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See paragraph Patients, material and methods (Surface phenotyping by flow cytometry) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-02-0400 | [X] - N. LEE ET AL, "HLA-E is a major ligand for the natural killer inhibitory receptor CD94/NKG2A", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1998), vol. 95, pages 5199 - 5204, XP002374950 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See Materials and methods (antibodies and antisera) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.9.5199 | [X] - SHIN J-S ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES WITH VARIOUS REACTIVITY TO P58 KILLER INHIBITORY RECEPTORS", HYBRIDOMA, LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199912), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0272-457X, pages 521 - 527, XP001041418 [X] 1-19,21,44,45,48,49 * See Materials and methods (table I) * | [X] - C. WATZL ET AL, "Homogeneous expression of killer cell immunoglobulin-like receptors (KIR) on polyclonal natural killer cells detected by a monoclonal antibody to KIR2D", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2000), vol. 56, pages 240 - 247, XP002374951 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See Materials and methods (antibodies) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-0039.2000.560306.x | [X] - N. WAGTMANN ET AL, "Killer cell inhibitory receptors specific for HLA-C and HLA-B identified by direct binding and by functional transfer", IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, pages 801 - 809, XP002374952 [X] 1-11,13-15,19,21,44,45,48,49 * See experimental procedures (cells and antibodies) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1074-7613(95)90069-1 | Examination | - PASCAL V. ET AL, "Detection of KIR3DS1 on the cell surface of peripheral blood NK cells facilitates identification of a novel null allele and assessment of KIR3DS1 expression during HIV-1 infection", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 179, no. 3, pages 1625 - 1633 | - THANANCHAI HATHAIRAT, "Cutting Edge: Allele-specific and peptide-dependent interactions between KIR3DL1 and HLA-A and HLA-B", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 178, no. 1, pages 33 - 37 | - THOMAS R, ET AL, "Novel KIR3DL1 alleles and their expression levels on NK cells: convergent evolution of KIR3DL1 phenotype variation?", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 180, no. 10, pages 6743 - 6760 | - LI H. ET AL, "Genetic control of variegated KIR gene expression : polymorphisms of the bi-directional KIRDL1 promoter are associated with distinct frequencies of gene expression", PLOS GENETICS, (2008), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 1 - 11 | - PASCAL V. ET AL, "Detection of KIR3DS1 on the cell surface of peripheral blood NK cells facilitates identification of a novel Null allel and seessmenet of KIR3DS1 expression during HIV -1 infection", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 179, pages 1625 - 1633 | - THANACHAI H. ET AL, "Allele-specific and peptide-dependent interactions between KIR3DL1 and HLA-A and HLA-B", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 178, pages 33 - 37 | - LI H. ET AL, "Genetic control ogf variegated KIR gene expression: polymorphisms of the bi-directional KIR3Dl1 promoter are associated with distinct frequencies of gene expression", PLOS GENETICS, (2008), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 1 - 11 | by applicant | US4816397 | US4816567 | WO9849292 | US5916771 | WO0002583 | WO0050081 | US6162963 | WO03040170 | US2003095965 | WO03064606 | WO2005003172 | WO2005003168 | WO2005009465 | WO2005060375 | - LANIER, ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 225 - 74 | - KARRE ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 675 - 8 | - OHIEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 666 - 8 | - FAURE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 170, pages 6107 - 6114 | - FAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 98, page 1734 | - MORETTA ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOGENET., (1997), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 455 - 68 | - VALIANTE ET AL., IMMUNOL REV, (1997), vol. 155, pages 155 - 64 | - LANIER, ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 16, pages 359 - 93 | - RUGGERI ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 295, pages 2097 - 2100 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - M. CARRINGTON; P. NORMAN, THE KIR GENE CLUSTER | - PEARSON, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1990), vol. 183, pages 63 - 98 | - PEARSON, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 132, pages 185 - 219 | - LITWIN ET AL., JOUR NAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (1993), vol. 178, pages 1321 - 1336 | - WAGTMANN ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, pages 801 - 809 | - EHRING H, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 267, no. 2, pages 252 - 259 | - ENGEN, J.R.; SMITH, D.L., ANAL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 73, pages 256A - 265A | - ERNST SCHERING RES FOUND WORKSHOP, (2004), no. 44, pages 149 - 67 | - HUANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 281, no. 1, pages 61 - 67 | - SAITO; PATTERSON, METHODS, (199606), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 516 - 24 | - DOWNWARD, J MASS SPECTROM., (200004), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 493 - 503 | - KISELAR; DOWNARD, ANAL CHEM., (19990501), vol. 71, no. 9, pages 1792 - 801 | - MANCA, ANN IST SUPER SANITA, (1991), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 15 - 9 | - SOL MA; PAZOS F; VALENCIA A, J. MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 326, pages 1289 - 1302 | - SCHNEIDMAN-DUHOVNY D; NUSSINOV R; WOLFSON HJ, CURR. MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 11, pages 91 - 107 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - SKERRA ET AL., CURR. OPINION IN IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 5, page 256 | - PLUCKTHUN, IMMUNOL. REVS., (1992), vol. 130, page 151 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 544 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1984), vol. 81, page 6851 | - RUKER ET AL., ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1991), vol. 646, pages 212 - 219 | - BIANCHI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 84, pages 439 - 444 | - SOO KIM ET AL., BIO- TECHNOL. PROG., (2001), vol. 17, pages 69 - 75 | - KING ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 281, pages 317 - 323 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 522 | - REICHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, page 593 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, page 323 | - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 1534 | - SIMS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 151, page 2296 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, page 901 | - CARTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 51 | - JAKOBOVITZ ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, page 255 | - WILLIAMS; POLLI, J. PARENTERAL SCI. TECHNOL., (1984), vol. 38, pages 48 - 59 | - MASTERS, Spray-Drying Handbook, LONGMAN SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL, (1991), pages 491 - 676 | - BROADHEAD ET AL., DRUG DEVEL. IND. PHARM., (1992), vol. 18, pages 1169 - 1206 | - MUMENTHALER ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1994), vol. 11, pages 12 - 20 | - CARPENTER; CROWE, CRYOBIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 25, pages 459 - 470 | - ROSER, BIOPHARM., (1991), vol. 4, pages 47 - 53 | - "Handbook of Pharmaceutical Controlled Release", Drug and the Pharmaceutical Sciences, MARCEL DEKKER, (2000), vol. 99 | - YU J; HIEN YW, "Pulmonary drug delivery: Physiologic and mechanistic aspects", CRIT REV THER DRUG CARR SYS, (1997), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 395 - 453 | - EDWARDS DA; BEN-JEBRIA A; LANGER R., "Recent advances in pulmonary drug delivery using large, porous inhaled particles", J APPL PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 379 - 385 | - EDWARDS DA; BEN-JEBRIA A; LANGER R, "Recent advances in pulmonary drug delivery using large, porous inhaled particles", J APPL PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 379 - 385 | - EDWARDS DA; BEN-JEBRIA A; LANGER A, "Recent advances in pulmonary drug delivery using large, porous inhaled particles", J APPL PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 379 - 385 | - FAN ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 389, pages 96 - 100 | - MITRA ET AL., CURRENT BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 14, pages 718 - 724 | - H.M. BERMAN; J. WESTBROOK; Z. FENG; G. GILLILAND; T.N. BHAT; H. WEISSIG; I.N. SHINDYALOV; P.E. BOURNE, "The Protein Data Bank", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 235 - 242 | - KABSCH, J., APPL. CRYSTALLOGR., (1993), vol. 26, pages 795 - 800 | - BAILEY, ACTA CRYSTALLOGR. SECT. D-BIOL. CRYSTALLOGR., (1994), vol. 50, pages 760 - 763 | - LAMZIN; WILSON, "Acta Crystallogr", SECT. D-BIOL. CRYSTALLOGR., (1993), vol. 49, pages 129 - 147 | - WAGTMANN ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 801 - 9 | - LITWIN ET AL., J EXP MED., (1993), vol. 178, pages 1321 - 36 |