EP1847126 - Method for monitoring and configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/43] | METHOD OF MONITORING AND CONFIGURING | ||
[2012/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Systems International Sarl Avenue des Uttins 5 1180 Rolle / CH | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Cisco Systems International Sarl Avenue des Uttins 5 1180 Rolle / CH | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Tandberg Telecom AS Philip Pedersens vei 22 1366 Lysaker / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAURNES, Jarl, Ove Asbjørn Klosters vei 11 N-1472 Fjellhamar / NO | 02 /
GJØDUM, Nicolai Oscarsgt. 54 N-0258 Oslo / NO | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Onsagers Ltd c/o Innovation Norway 5 Lower Regent Street London SW1Y 4LR / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Tönhardt, Marion Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06701735.0 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006NO00038 | Priority number, date | NO20050000625 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: NO 20050625 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006083171 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847126 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847126 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15, H04L12/18 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H04L61/2553 (EP,US);
H04L43/04 (US);
H04L61/2564 (EP,US);
H04L61/5014 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Überwachungs- und Konfigurationsverfahren | [2012/11] | English: | Method for monitoring and configuration | [2012/11] | French: | Procédé de surveillance et de configuration | [2012/11] |
Former [2007/43] | METHODE DER ÜBERWACHUNG UND DER KONFIGURATION | ||
Former [2007/43] | METHOD OF MONITORING AND CONFIGURING | ||
Former [2007/43] | PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE CONFIGURATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2006 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | IE | 27.01.2013 | LU | 27.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 27.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002141352 (FANGMAN RICHARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0254] - paragraph [0342] *; | [X] - TANDBERG, "TANDBERG Management Suite Administrator?s guide D13741, Rev 1", (2004), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://www.tandberg.com/collateral/tms_documentation/TANDBERG_Management_Suite_Admin_Guide_D1374101.pdf, (20091208), XP002559335 [X] 1-7 * paragraph [03.2] - paragraph [03.3] * | [A] - TANDBERG, "TANDBERG 770 MXP", (200407), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://omnipresence.com/PDFs/TANDBERG_770MXP.pdf, (20091208), XP002559336 [A] 1-7 * page 2 * | [L] - TANDBERG, "TANDBERG Management Suite v9 Release Document D50302, Rev 1.8", pages 1 - 38, URL: http://ftp.tandberg.com/pub/software/tms/TANDBERG%20Software%20Release%20-%20TMS%20(9).pdf, (20091208), XP002559337 [L] * This document proves that the TANDBERG Management Suite v9.6 was released on Feb 7 2004 (see paragraph 3.1) * | International search | [A]EP0717544 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [X]WO0208856 (BURSTBAND TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al); | [X]US2002093948 (DERTZ GREGORY A [US], et al); | [X]US2003125995 (YAMATARI MITSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]EP1427211 (NOVA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2004053761 (CHO HYUN-KYUN [KR]) |