EP1834699 - THERMAL SPRAYING NOZZLE DEVICE AND THERMAL SPRAYING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 10-26, Wakinohama-cho 2-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODA, Tsuyoshi, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 02 /
MIYAKE, Toshiya, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 5-5, Tatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | 03 /
HATA, Hideo, Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho 5-5, Tatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06702045.3 | 06.01.2006 | [2007/38] | WO2006JP300065 | Priority number, date | JP20050002535 | 07.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005002535 | [2007/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073171 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834699 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/04, C23C4/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B05B7/168 (EP,US);
B05B7/1463 (EP,US);
C23C4/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜSENVORRICHTUNG FÜR THERMISCHES SPRITZEN UND AUSRÜSTUNG FÜR THERMISCHES SPRITZEN | [2007/38] | English: | THERMAL SPRAYING NOZZLE DEVICE AND THERMAL SPRAYING EQUIPMENT | [2007/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BUSE DE PULVERISATION THERMIQUE ET EQUIPEMENT DE PULVERISATION THERMIQUE | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2007 | Translation filed | 18.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 14.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2639490 (BRENNAN JOSEPH B) [A] 7,8 * column 3, line 29 - line 31; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4619845 (AYERS JACK D [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7,8 * column 3, line 11 - line 20 * * column 4, line 11 - line 16 * * column 4, line 41 - line 46 * * column 6, line 3 - line 14 * * column 6, line 36 - line 37; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2214108 (US ENERGY [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 8, line 21 - line 34; figures 1,2; claims 1-16 *; | [A]EP0444767 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 42 * * column 4, line 16 - line 21 * * column 8, line 16 - line 33; figures 2-5; claims 1,12,14 *; | [Y]WO9206797 (US ENERGY [US]) [Y] 1-4 * page 20, line 20 - page 23, line 4; claims 1,10,13,14 *; | [YA]US5529809 (GLOVAN RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 15 - line 24 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 25 * * column 5, line 39 - line 49 * * column 6, line 15 - line 19 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 22 * * column 8, line 11 - line 16 * * column 12, line 27 - line 33; figure 1; claims 1-18 * [A] 7,8; | [A]EP0848078 (HOWMET RES CORP [US]) [A] 7,8 * column 12, line 26 - line 42 * * column 13, line 16 - line 24; figure 1; claims 1,2,12 *; | [A]EP1398394 (HOWMET RES CORP [US]) |