EP1838502 - ELECTRIC HAIR TRIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKE, Wolfgang Walter-Rietig-Str. 41 63225 Langen / DE | 02 /
BEHRENDT, Jürgen Limburger Str. 54 65611 Niederbrechen / DE | [2007/40] | Application number, filing date | 06702655.9 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006EP00158 | Priority number, date | DE20051002896 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005002896 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077032 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838502 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838502 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/06, B26B19/38 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B26B19/10 (EP,US);
B26B19/042 (EP,US);
B26B19/06 (EP,US);
B26B19/288 (EP,US);
B26B19/384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES HAARSCHNEIDEGERÄT | [2007/40] | English: | ELECTRIC HAIR TRIMMER | [2007/40] | French: | TONDEUSE ELECTRIQUE POUR LES CHEVEUX | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IE | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | LU | 11.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
LU | 11.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
LU | 11.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB781616 (PHILIPS ELECTRICAL IND LTD) [X] 1-3,5,12,17 * page 1, line 10 - page 3, line 21; figures 1-3; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2877548 (GERRIT STARRE) [X] 1-3,5,12,17 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0279088 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 4 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0428211 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,12,17 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 42; figures 1-9 *; | [DA]EP0914235 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [DA] 1,17* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-8a * | by applicant | EP0428211 | EP0914235 | EP0923430 |