EP1836450 - HEAT TRANSFER PIPE WITH CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHEC LABS - SOLAR HYDROGEN ENERGY CORPORATION 2214 Hanselman Avenue Saskatoon SK S7L 6A4 / CA | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCHELT, Maurice J. 172 Colwell Road Regina, Saskatchewan S4R 4K8 / CA | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Maillet, Alain Cabinet Le Guen Maillet 5, place Newquay B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Maillet, Alain Cabinet le Guen & Maillet, 5, Place Newquay, B.P. 70250 35802 Dinard Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06703288.8 | 10.01.2006 | [2007/39] | WO2006CA00017 | Priority number, date | CA20052491950 | 11.01.2005 Original published format: CA 2491950 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006074539 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836450 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 20.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/02 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
F28D15/06 (EP,US);
F28D15/0275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HITZEÜBERTRAGUNGSROHR MIT STEUERUNG | [2007/39] | English: | HEAT TRANSFER PIPE WITH CONTROL | [2007/39] | French: | TUYAU DE TRANSFERT THERMIQUE ET COMMANDE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 27.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 27.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.04.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2011 | 31.01.2012 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3924674 (BASIULIS ALGERD) [X] 1-18* column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 40; figure - * | International search | [Y]US4438759 (KITAJIMA SOICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4957157 (DOWDY MACK W [US], et al); | [Y]US4280483 (SCHAFFER I LAWRENCE); | [A]US4210172 (CLEMENTS THOMAS W [US], et al); | [A]US4240405 (FRENCH ROGER F [US]) |