EP1846487 - THERMOPLASTIC POLYAMIDES FILLED WITH SPHERICAL-SHAPED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDTNER, Jochen Jakob-böhme-str.4 51065 Köln / DE | 02 /
JOACHIMI, Detlev Scheiblerstr. 103 47800 Krefeld / DE | [2007/43] | Application number, filing date | 06703896.8 | 25.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006EP00626 | Priority number, date | DE20051004892 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005004892 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081968 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846487 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846487 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/32, C08K7/20, C08L77/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C08J9/0014 (EP);
C08J9/32 (EP);
C08K5/34 (EP);
C08K7/20 (EP);
C08K7/28 (EP);
C08J2377/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/34, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K7/20, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K7/28, C08L77/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT KUGELFÖRMIGEM GLAS GEFÜLLTE THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYAMIDE | [2007/43] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC POLYAMIDES FILLED WITH SPHERICAL-SHAPED GLASS | [2007/43] | French: | POLYAMIDES THERMOPLASTIQUES REMPLIS DE VERRE SPHERIQUE | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 19.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IE | 10.09.2008 | LT | 10.09.2008 | LV | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | PL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | IS | 10.01.2009 | AT | 25.01.2009 | LU | 25.01.2009 | BE | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
AT | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
AT | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
AT | 25.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
AT | 25.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 10.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1930461 (WELLMAN INC) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 19 - page 2, line 24 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 31 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE2343445 (G ILLING KG DR) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 17 - page 2, line 21 * * page 3, line 29 - page 3, line 33 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]GB2188935 (GLAVERBEL) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 17 - page 1, line 22 * * examples 4,5 * * tables I,II * * claims 5-11,20,22 *; | [AD]EP1111002 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0034] ** claim 1 *; | [PA]WO2005092961 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [PA] 1-10 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 34 * * claims 1,5 * |