EP1848600 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR FLOW IN THE INTERIOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONNENMACHER, Peter Gerhart-Hauptmann-Strasse 55 71116 Gärtringen / DE | 02 /
STRAUB, Wolfgang Obere Morgen 18 73326 Deggingen / DE | 03 /
VINNEMANN, Thomas Am Bopserweg 11 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/44] | Application number, filing date | 06703916.4 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP00706 | Priority number, date | DE20051006946 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005006946 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087081 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848600 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B60H1/00978 (EP,US);
B60H1/00828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/11] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES LUFTSTROMS IN EINEN INNENRAUM EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2007/44] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR FLOW IN THE INTERIOR OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN COURANT D'AIR DANS L'HABITACLE D'UN VEHICULE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 18.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/50] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE10132891 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] *; | [DA]EP0428523 (AUDI AG) [DA] 1,5 * page 1, line 16 - page 2, line 26 *; | [A]DE4033092 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 8 * | by applicant | EP0428523 | DE10132891 |