Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
14.07.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.01.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.01.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.04.2008 | Change - extension states | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
08.02.2008 | Change - designated states | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
02.02.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
23.01.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
17.10.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.09.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
28.09.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
01.08.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.07.2007 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.09.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.03.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication |