Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1888317
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.03.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
10.11.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
16.05.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
18.01.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
18.01.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
15.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2008 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
15.01.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
15.01.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2007 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|