EP1888317 - SOCKETING OF PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vinidex Pty Limited 19-21 Loyalty Road North Rocks New South Wales 2151 / AU | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACOVAZ, George C/- Vinidex Pty Limited 19-21 Loyalty Road North Rocks, New South Wales 2151 / AU | 02 /
CHAPMAN, Peter, Glanville C/- Vinidex Pty Limited 19-21 Loyalty Road North Rocks, New South Wales 2151 / AU | 03 /
GOTHAM, Joshua, Stanley C/- Vinidex Pty Limited 19-21 Loyalty Road North Rocks, New South Wales 2151 / AU | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Pronovem Pronovem Luxembourg 12, avenue du Rock n' Roll BP 327 4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | pronovem Meyers & Van Malderen 261, route d'Arlon B.P. 111 8002 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2008/08] | pronovem Office Van Malderen Bld. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 06704995.7 | 13.03.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006AU00322 | Priority number, date | AU20050901213 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: AU 2005901213 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006094361 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888317 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/02, B29C53/08, B29C57/02, F16L47/06, B29C53/84, B29C57/04, B29C57/00, B29C57/06 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
B29C57/02 (EP,US);
F16L47/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSEHEN EINES ROHRS MIT EINER MUFFE | [2008/08] | English: | SOCKETING OF PIPE | [2008/08] | French: | ETAPE DE MANCHONNAGE DE TUYAU | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 07.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AP]CN1628953 ; | [A]JP2000266257 ; | [A]JP2000158529 ; | [A]JPH11221853 ; | [A]JPH09193250 ; | [A]JPH0885149 ; | [A]JPH0639914 ; | [A]WO9315347 (WOLF WOCO & CO FRANZ J [DE]); | [A]WO9622184 (SCHNALLINGER HELMUTH MICHAEL [AT]); | [A]US6146572 (VISSCHER JAN [NL]); | [A]EP1122485 (HIGASHIO MECH CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]US2005230859 (HAMAGUCHI MAKI [JP], et al); | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 18, Database accession no. 2006-165253, XP008114430 & CN1628953 A 20050622 (LIU Q ET AL.) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 61, Database accession no. 2000-635506, XP008114431 & JP2000266257 A 20000926 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 39, Database accession no. 2000-446233, XP008114432 & JP2000158529 A 20000613 (FUJIKURA LTD) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 43, Database accession no. 1999-511963, XP008114433 & JPH11221853 A 19990817 (SEKISUI CHEM IND CO LTD) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 40, Database accession no. 1997-430417, XP008114438 & JPH09193250 A 19970729 (SANNAN T) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 23, Database accession no. 1996-224663, XP008114439 & JPH0885149 A 19960402 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND LTD) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 11, Database accession no. 1994-089010, XP008114434 & JPH0639914 A 19940215 (NISHIKAWA GOMU KOGYO KK) |