EP1844245 - TORQUE LIMITED DECOUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 5T7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge Ontario L4L 5T9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTCHAK, John, R. 2015 Grand Vista Court Innisfil, Ontario L9S 4A6 / CA | 02 /
KAIPONEN, Mark 1071 Stouffville Road Richmond Hill, Ontario L4E 3S2 / CA | 03 /
GRANIERO, Robert 108 Bellview Avenue Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 5N5 / CA | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06705094.8 | 03.02.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006CA00129 | Priority number, date | US20050649520P | 03.02.2005 Original published format: US 649520 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081657 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844245 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844245 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/20, F16H7/00, F16D7/02, F02B67/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
F16D43/211 (EP,US);
F16D41/20 (KR);
F02B67/06 (KR);
F16D41/206 (EP,US);
F16D7/02 (KR);
F16D7/022 (EP,US);
F16H55/36 (EP,US);
F16H7/00 (KR);
E05Y2201/49 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, IT, PL [2008/17] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTBEGRENZTER ENTKOPPLER | [2007/42] | English: | TORQUE LIMITED DECOUPLER | [2007/42] | French: | DECOUPLEUR A COUPLE LIMITE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 04.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3618730 (MOULD HERBERT); | [X]US6083130 (MEVISSEN PIERRE A [CA], et al); | [A]WO2004011818 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE [CA], et al); | [AP]WO2005057037 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA], et al) |