EP1853906 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAMPLE DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MDS Inc. doing business through its MDS Sciex Division 71 Four Valley Drive Concord, Ontario L4K 4V8 / CA | For all designated states Applera Corporation Global Headquarters, 301 Merritt 7, P.O. Box 5435 Norwalk, CT 06856-5435 / US | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COVEY, Thomas 187 Elgin Mills Road West Richmond Hill, Ontario L4V 4M1 / CA | 02 /
KOVARIK, Peter 70 Miramar Dr. Markham, Ontario L6E 1Z9 / CA | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Roberts, Mark Peter, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06705124.3 | 08.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006CA00168 | Priority number, date | US20050651362P | 08.02.2005 Original published format: US 651362 P | CA20052496481 | 09.02.2005 Original published format: CA 2496481 | US20050651203P | 10.02.2005 Original published format: US 651203 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006084354 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853906 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 17.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/80, B01L11/00, B01D15/08, B01D15/14, B01D15/10 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G01N30/84 (EP);
B01L3/0268 (EP);
H01J49/0431 (EP);
B01L2400/027 (EP);
B01L2400/0487 (EP);
G01N2030/8411 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PROBENABLAGE | [2007/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAMPLE DEPOSITION | [2007/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DEPOT D'ECHANTILLONS | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 14.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2008 | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5162650 (BIER MARK E [US]) [Y] 22-24,30-31,37-43 * abstract * * column 3, lines 25-38; claim 1 * * column 4, lines 33-38 *; | [XAYI]US2002092366 (BROCK ANSGAR [US], et al) [X] 1,4,12-15,20-21,25,33 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1; claims 1,5,9 * * figure 2 * * claims 3,26 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0022] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] * [A] 17,35 [Y] 10,22-24,30-31,37-43,48,50-51 [I] 2-3,5-9,11,18-19,26-29,32,34,36,44-47,49; | [Y]US2003034450 (KARGER BARRY L [US], et al) [Y] 50-51 * claim 11 * * paragraphs [0095] , [0102]; figures 14,15A,15B,16 ** paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]WO03037515 (PERSEPTIVE BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 10,48 * claims 9,20 * * page 7, lines 3-14 * * figure 4 * | International search | [Y]US5369035 ; | [Y]US4695555 ; | [Y]US6737022 ; | [Y]US6822231 ; | [A]US4980057 ; | [AP]US6867415 |