EP1934042 - COMPOSITE LAMINATED SHEET MATERIAL FOR CONTAINMENT SUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZCL COMPOSITES INC 6907- 36 Street Edmonton, AB T6B 2Z6 / CA | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCRAGG, Richard, Raymond 7120 - 94B Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6B 0Z9 / CA | 02 /
FINK, Ronald, James Site 9, Box 21, RR 1 Edmonton, Alberta T6H 4N6 / CA | 03 /
VEZINA, Etienne 824 Graydon Court Edmonton, Alberta T5T 6K7 / CA | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
SCRAGG, Richard, Raymond 7120 - 94B Avenue Edmonton, Alberta T6B 0Z9 / CA | ||
02 /
FINK, Ronald, James Site 9, Box 14,RR 1 South Edmonton, Alberta T6H 4N6 / CA | |||
03 /
VEZINA, Etienne 824 Graydon Court Edmonton, Alberta T5T 6K7 / CA | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06705256.3 | 28.02.2006 | [2008/26] | WO2006CA00302 | Priority number, date | CA20052499849 | 09.03.2005 Original published format: CA 2499849 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006094382 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1934042 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1934042 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/04, B32B1/00, B32B27/12, B32B27/04, B29C70/08, // B32B1/02, B65D90/24, B67D7/32 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B29C70/0035 (EP,US);
B29C70/222 (EP,US);
B29C70/30 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B37/00 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B65D90/24 (EP,US);
B67D7/78 (EP,US);
B29K2101/10 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29L2031/712 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0253 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0276 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2066 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3813 (EP,US);
Y10T442/674 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | B32B7/04, B32B1/00, B32B27/12, B32B27/04, B29C70/08, // B32B1/02, B65D90/24, B67D5/32 | ||
Former IPC [2008/26] | B32B27/04, B32B27/28, B32B5/10, B29C41/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | LAMINIERTES VERBUNDBAHNMATERIAL FÜR CONTAINMENT-SÜMPFE | [2008/26] | English: | COMPOSITE LAMINATED SHEET MATERIAL FOR CONTAINMENT SUMPS | [2008/26] | French: | FEUILLE DE METAL LAMINEE EN MATERIAU COMPOSITE POUR PUISARD EN FONDS D'ENCEINTE | [2008/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 20.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 20.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | BE | 07.04.2010 | CZ | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | EE | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | HU | 07.04.2010 | IT | 07.04.2010 | LT | 07.04.2010 | LV | 07.04.2010 | NL | 07.04.2010 | PL | 07.04.2010 | RO | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | SI | 07.04.2010 | SK | 07.04.2010 | TR | 07.04.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | BG | 07.07.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | IS | 07.08.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
TR | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 07.07.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
RO | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SK | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
EE | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
LT | 07.04.2010 | ||
LV | 07.04.2010 | ||
NL | 07.04.2010 | ||
PL | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
IS | 07.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 07.04.2010 | |
SI | 07.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | SI | 07.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS56133124 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]US5366318 (BRANCHER RODNEY E [US]); | [X]WO0056524 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) | International search | [A]US4992228 (HECK HENRY G [DE], et al); | [X]US5057353 (MARANCI ARTUN [US], et al); | [X]US5496602 (WAI MARTIN P [US]); | [A]WO9930073 (PETROTECHNIK LTD [GB], et al); | [X]WO0056524 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al); | [X]WO03022020 (DU PONT [US]) |