EP1843907 - TWIST BEAM AXLE WITH INTEGRAL TORSION BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA INTERNATIONAL INC 337 Magna Drive Aurora Ontario L4G 7K1 / CA | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABBIANELLI, Gianfranco 1667 Picadilly Troy, Michigan 48084 / US | 02 /
KISELIS, P., Gregory 35173 Six Mile Rd Livonia, Michigan 48152 / US | 03 /
WERNER, Mark, F. 5985 Abbott Street LaSalle, Ontario N9J 3L6 / CA | 04 /
KOTAGIRI, Seetarama, S. 260 Woodside Ct., 231 Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US | 05 /
WOMACK, Darren, A. 3015 Emilia Road Windsor, Ontario N9E 4N4 / CA | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Hössle, Markus Hössle Kudlek & Partner Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Hössle, Markus Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06705331.4 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006CA00390 | Priority number, date | US20050661932P | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 661932 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006096980 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843907 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 21.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/05, B62D65/12, B21D17/04, B60B35/02, B21K1/06 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
B60B35/04 (EP,US);
B60G21/05 (KR);
B21K1/06 (KR);
B60B35/02 (KR);
B60G21/051 (EP,US);
B62D65/12 (KR);
B60G2200/21 (EP,US);
B60G2202/1362 (EP,US);
B60G2206/0122 (EP,US);
B60G2206/014 (EP,US);
B60G2206/202 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [2008/16] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDLENKERACHSE MIT INTEGRIERTEM DREHBALKEN | [2007/42] | English: | TWIST BEAM AXLE WITH INTEGRAL TORSION BAR | [2007/42] | French: | ESSIEU A POUTRE TORSADEE AVEC BARRE DE TORSION INTEGRALE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 17.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0992375 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [X]EP1036679 (THYSSEN KRUPP AUTOMOTIVE AG [DE]) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001088525 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,11 * abstract *; | [PX]DE102004003152 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [PX] 1,11* abstract *; | [PX]FR2874537 (AUTO CHASSIS INTERNAT SNC SNC [FR]) [PX] 1,11 * abstract * | International search | [X]EP1454776 (AUTO CHASSIS INT SNC [FR]); | [Y]EP0552537 (BENTELER IND INC [US]) | by applicant | US6616157 | US6401319 | US5520407 | US5518265 | US5409254 | US5246248 | US5324073 | US5409255 | US6059314 | US6119501 |