EP1843556 - A MOBILE TERMINAL AND BOOT METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Watch Data System Co., Ltd. YanDong Business Park No.2, Wanhong West Street Capital Airport Rd, Chaoyang Dist. Beijing 100015 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Beijing Watch Data System Co. Ltd. YanDong Business Park No.2, Wanhong West Street Capital Airport Rd, Chaoyang Dist. Beijing 100015 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Youjun, Beijing Watch Data System Co, Ltd. YanDong Business Park No.2, Wanhong West Street Capital Airport Road, Chaoyan District, Beijing 100015 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Xiang, Beijing Watch Data System Co, Ltd. YanDong Business Park No.2, Wanhong West Street Capital Airport Road, Chaoyan District, Beijing 100015 / CN | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06705547.5 | 24.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006CN00126 | Priority number, date | CN20051004917 | 28.01.2005 Original published format: CN200510004917 | [2007/41] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079281 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | ZH | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843556 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G06F9/445 (EP);
H04M1/72403 (EP);
H04M1/72406 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND STARTVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/41] | English: | A MOBILE TERMINAL AND BOOT METHOD THEREOF | [2007/41] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE ET PROCEDE D'AMORCAGE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2007 | Translation filed | 13.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/01] | 23.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1465067 (TREK 2000 INT LTD [SG]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] *; | [Y]WO2004097591 (360 DEGREE WEB INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 19 - line 25 * * page 5, line 21 - line 29 ** page 8, line 1 - line 5 * | International search | [A]CN1525759 (VIMICRO CORP BEIJING [CN]); | [A]CN1436016 (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD SHENZHEN [CN]); | [A]JP2004310401 (NEC CORP); | [A]US2002103988 (DORNIER PASCAL [US]); | [A]KR100343779B | Examination | KR20020077607 | by applicant | EP1465067 | WO2004097591 |