EP1853574 - PROCESS FOR MAKING TRANS-1-((1R,3S)-6-CHLORO-3-PHENYLINDAN-1-YL)-3,3-DIMETHYLPIPERAZINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Lundbeck A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states H. LUNDBECK A/S Ottiliavej 9 2500 Valby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHL, Allan, Carsten Vielstedvej 8, Vielsted DK-4296 Nyrup / DK | 02 /
WO̸HLK NIELSEN, Christina Lyngbyvej 91, 2. Tv DK-2100 Copenhagen O̸ / DK | 03 /
SUTEU, Christina 14 Rue Du Lt Homps F-67400 Illkirch / FR | 04 /
ROBIN, David 25, rue de la Haute Montée 67000 Strasbourg / FR | 05 /
BRO̸SEN, Peter Kanonvej 45 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
DAHL, Allan, Carsten Vielstedvej 8, Vielsted DK-4296 Nyrup / DK | ||
02 /
WO̸HLK NIELSEN, Christina Lyngbyvej 91, 2. Tv DK-2100 Copenhagen O̸ / DK | |||
03 /
SUTEU, Christina 14 Rue Du Lt Homps F-67400 Illkirch / FR | |||
04 /
ROBIN, David 6 rue du Travail 67000 Strasbourg / FR | |||
05 /
BRO̸SEN, Peter Kanonvej 45 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | Application number, filing date | 06706057.4 | 14.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006DK00086 | Priority number, date | DK20050000237 | 16.02.2005 Original published format: DK 200500237 | US20050653428P | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 653428 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006086984 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853574 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/073, C07C49/697, C07C29/143, C07C45/67, C07C45/78, C07C17/16, C07C25/22, C07C45/29 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
C07D295/073 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/06 (KR);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
C07C17/16 (EP,US);
C07C25/22 (EP,US);
C07C29/143 (EP,US);
C07C45/292 (EP,US);
C07C45/67 (EP,US);
C07C45/78 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/16, C07C25/22 (EP,US);
C07C29/143, C07C35/52 (EP,US);
C07C45/292, C07C49/697 (US,EP);
C07C45/67, C07C49/697 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/46] | C07D295/073, C07C49/697 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | 17.09.2007 | BA | 17.09.2007 | HR | 17.09.2007 | MK | 17.09.2007 | YU | 17.09.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRANS-1-((1R, 3S)-6-CHLOR-3-PHENYLINDAN-1-YL)-3,3-DIMETHYLPIPERAZIN | [2007/46] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING TRANS-1-((1R,3S)-6-CHLORO-3-PHENYLINDAN-1-YL)-3,3-DIMETHYLPIPERAZINE | [2007/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE LA TRANS-1-[(1R,3S)-6-CHLORO-3-PHENYLINDAN-1-YL]-3,3-DIMETHYLPIPERAZINE | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.09.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 20.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9322293 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [DY] 1-39,1-39,1-39 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 22 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 8 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 22 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 8 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 22 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 8 *; | [PDX]WO2005016901 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [PDX] 1-39,1-39,1-39 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 13 * * page 15, line 17 - page 17, line 7 * * claims 22-33 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 13 * * page 15, line 17 - page 17, line 7 * * claims 22-33 * * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 13 * * page 15, line 17 - page 17, line 7 * * claims 22-33 *; | [PDX]WO2005016900 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) [PDX] 1-39,1-39,1-39 * claims 18-41 * * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 18 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 12 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 18 * * page 28; example 5 * * claims 18-41 * * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 18 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 12 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 18 * * page 28; example 5 * * claims 18-41 * * page 9, line 16 - page 12, line 18 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 12 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 18 ** page 28; example 5 *; | [DY] - BOGESO K P ET AL, "ENHANCED D1 AFFINITY IN A SERIES OF PIPERAZINE RING SUBSTITUTED 1-PIPERAZINO-3-ARYLINDANS WITH POTENTIAL ATYPICAL ANTIPSYCHOTIC ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (1995), vol. 38, no. 22, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4380 - 4392, XP008037648 [DY] 1-39,1-39,1-39 * page 4383; figure 1 * * page 4383; figure 1 * * page 4383; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00022a004 | Examination | US6410794 | US6455736 | - Shen K. Yang ET AL, "Base-catalyzed racemization of 3-O-acyloxazepam", Chirality, (19940101), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1002/chir.530060416, ISSN 0899-0042, pages 321 - 328, XP055113900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chir.530060416 | - James R. Keeffe ET AL, "Kinetics and mechanism of enolization and ketonization", Enols (1990), Chichester, UK, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (19900725), pages 399 - 480, doi:10.1002/9780470772294.ch7, ISBN 978-0-47-191720-5, XP055113912 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470772294.ch7 | by applicant | WO2005016900 | - BØGESØ ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 4380 - 4392 | WO2004DK00546 |