EP1838829 - ANTIADHESIVE POLYMER FOR PREVENTION OF ADHESION OF MICROORGANISMS TO TEXTILES AND FOR PREVENTION OF LAUNDRY ODOURS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCKMÜHL, Dirk Am Anschlag 61 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
HÖHNE, Heide-Marie Curieweg 28 40591 Dèsseldorf / DE | 03 /
WRUBBEL, Noelle Scheurenstr. 41 40215 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
HEIDEMEIER, Dorothee Rathelbachstr. 274 40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
DAHLMANN, Doris Am Steinebrück 15 b 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
PLANTENBERG, Thomas Am Webersbüschken 7 40822 Mettmann / DE | 07 /
JONKE, Hermann Sudetenstr. 26 40231 Düsseldorf / DE | 08 /
BAYERSDÖRFER, Rolf Sülldorfer Mühlenweg 30a 22589 Hamburg / DE | 09 /
SCHÄFER, Andre Holzweg 40 40789 Monheim / DE | 10 /
BREVES, Roland Schwalbenweg 5 40822 Mettmann / DE | [2007/40] | Application number, filing date | 06706220.8 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006EP00255 | Priority number, date | DE20051003122 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005003122 | [2007/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006077049 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1838829 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838829 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/22, C11D3/37, D06M16/00, D06M15/564, C08F283/06, C08G18/66, C08G18/10, C08G18/48, C08L51/08 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
D06M16/00 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/6692 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/3707 (EP,US);
C11D3/3715 (EP,US);
C11D3/3719 (EP,US);
C11D3/3726 (EP,US);
C11D3/3788 (EP,US);
C11D3/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2825 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/765 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | ANTIADHESIVE POLYMER ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER ADHESION VON MIKROORGANISMEN AN TEXTILIEN UND ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON WESCHEGERUCH | [2007/40] | English: | ANTIADHESIVE POLYMER FOR PREVENTION OF ADHESION OF MICROORGANISMS TO TEXTILES AND FOR PREVENTION OF LAUNDRY ODOURS | [2007/40] | French: | POLYMERES ANTI-ADHESIFS PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER L'ADHESION DE MICRO-ORGANISMES SUR DES TEXTILES ET AINSI L'ODEUR DU LINGE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | CY | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | CY | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0681213 ; | [X]DE1169670 (HOECHST AG) [X] 20 * example 2 *; | [X]EP0397246 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 21-27 * claims 1-5,7-9,14-17 *; | [A]GB2304286 (RHONE POULENC CHEMICALS [GB]) [A] 1-6,16,26,27 * page 1, lines 2-4 * * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 21 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE19842636 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 17-19* pages 9-12; example - *; | [A]WO9959808 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 17 * page 28; examples 3,4; table 1 *; | [X]DE19844892 (CREAVIS TECH & INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9,27 * page 2, lines 48-59 * * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 3 * * claims 1,11 *; | [X]US6146651 (KRITZLER STEVEN [AU]) [X] 1,2,26,27 * column 2, lines 35-48 *; | [X]WO0215853 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 20 * page 31; examples 5,6; table . *; | [X]WO0231096 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 21-27 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 39 * * page 9, lines 28-41 * * page 16, lines 11-33 * * pages 17-18; table 1 * * page 21, lines 2-9 * * page 22, line 40 - page 23, line 41; example 1 *; | [X]WO02064668 (MICROBAN PRODUCTS [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13-19,26,27 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * example 1 *; | [DX]WO03035712 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [DX] 18,26,27 * page 8, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 25, paragraphs 1,3; example SRP2 * * pages 26,27; example 2 *; | [X]WO03095559 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,16,26,27 * page 1, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * example 9 *; | [X]EP1449912 (COGNIS IBERIA SL [ES]) [X] 21-23,26,27 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] *; | [PX]WO2005056741 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PX] 1-6,8-16,21,23,24,26,27 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 5 * * page 25, paragraph 1 * * page 37, paragraph 4 * * pages 70-72; example -; table 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 16, Database accession no. 1994-132461, XP002381183 & JPH0681213 A 19940322 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,27 * column A * | Examination | DE3536530 |