EP1848674 - COMPOSITE CERAMIC HOLLOW FIBRES METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILGUS, Mirjam Schappachstrasse 2 72293 Glatten / DE | 02 /
SCHIESTEL, Thomas Darwinstrasse 8b 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Schwahn, Hartmut Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Schwahn, Hartmut Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706346.1 | 21.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP00539 | Priority number, date | DE20051005467 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005005467 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081957 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848674 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C04B35/62236 (EP,US);
B01D63/026 (EP,US);
B01D67/00411 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D69/087 (EP,US);
B01D71/0271 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/6225 (EP,US);
C04B35/62259 (EP,US);
C04B35/62272 (EP,US);
C04B35/62281 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (US);
C04B37/001 (EP,US);
C04B37/021 (EP,US);
C04B38/008 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/526 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5264 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5284 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/40 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/008, C04B35/80, C04B38/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDE KERAMISCHER HOHLFASERN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2007/44] | English: | COMPOSITE CERAMIC HOLLOW FIBRES METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF | [2007/44] | French: | COMPOSITES DE FIBRES CREUSES CERAMIQUES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 24.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB390199 (HERMSDORF SCHOMBURG ISOLATOREN); | [X]US3137602 (LINCOLN JOHN D); | [X]DE4425209 (JENOPTIK JENA GMBH [DE]); |