Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1849216
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
24.04.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
03.03.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.12.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
22.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
28.09.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
28.09.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
26.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.09.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|