EP1849216 - SEALED CONNECTION DEVICE AND SEALED CONNECTOR COUNTERPART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 145/147 Rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states FCI 145-147 Rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAZOTTES, Frédéric 48 Bis, rue de l'Aqueduc F-28130 Houx / FR | 02 /
CAMPFORT, Christian 28, rue Jeanne d'Arc F-28300 Fresnay le Gilmert / FR | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2007/44] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 06706506.0 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP00809 | Priority number, date | FR20050001155 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: FR 0501155 | [2007/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082016 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849216 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
H01R13/5219 (EP,US);
H01R13/502 (EP,US);
H01R13/516 (EP,US);
H01R13/518 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSIEGELTE VERBINDUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND VERSIEGELTES VERBINDERGEGENSTÜCK | [2007/44] | English: | SEALED CONNECTION DEVICE AND SEALED CONNECTOR COUNTERPART | [2007/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION ÉTANCHE ET CONTREPARTIE DE CONNECTEUR ÉTANCHE | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2002075523 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [X] 1-4,6-9,11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0015]; figures 2-4 * [Y] 10; | [A]EP1187265 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 4,5 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2002031934 (HARA TERUFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 10 * figures 9,11 *; | [A]DE19749852 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 10 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004102089 (CHEE ALEXANDER [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE20004565U (DBT AUTOM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * |