EP1851383 - DEVICE SUPPORT SLEEPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voestalpine BWG GmbH & Co.KG Wetzlarer Strasse 101 35510 Butzbach / DE | For all designated states VAE GmbH Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states voestalpine BWG GmbH & Co.KG Wetzlarer Strasse 101 35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
For all designated states VAE GmbH Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states BWG GmbH & Co. KG Wetzlarer Strasse 101 35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
For all designated states VAE GmbH Rotenturmstrasse 5-9 1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Josef Wittenberger Strasse 12 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans-Herbert Stoffregen Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11 b 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706896.5 | 13.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006EP01284 | Priority number, date | DE20051008828 | 24.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005008828 | [2007/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006089655 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1851383 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E01B3/20, E01B35/00, E01B1/00 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
E01B1/00 (KR);
E01B1/004 (EP);
E01B3/20 (EP,KR);
E01B35/00 (EP,KR);
B61L1/02 (EP);
B61L1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄTETRÄGERSCHWELLE | [2007/45] | English: | DEVICE SUPPORT SLEEPER | [2007/45] | French: | TRAVERSE PORTEUSE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0175230 (VAE EISENBAHNSYSTEME GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1130162 (PFLEIDERER INFRASTRUKTURT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 7-14 *; | [DA]DE4315200 (SCHWIHAG GMBH [CH]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |