EP1858834 - BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE GAS HYDRATE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEINWEBER, Dirk Theresenstrasse 40 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 02 /
FEUSTEL, Michael Auf der Nonnenwiese 34 55278 Köngernheim / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
LEINWEBER, Dirk Sossenheimer Weg 24 65824 Schwalbach / DE | ||
02 /
FEUSTEL, Michael Auf der Nonnenwiese 34 55278 Köngernheim / DE | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706995.5 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP01394 | Priority number, date | DE20051009134 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005009134 | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092208 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858834 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858834 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/305, C09K8/52 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C07C217/08 (EP,US);
C09K8/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/35] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE GASHYDRATINHIBITOREN | [2007/48] | English: | BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE GAS HYDRATE INHIBITORS | [2007/48] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'HYDRATES DE GAZ BIODEGRADABLES | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5244878 (SUGIER ANDRE [FR], et al) [AD] 1-6 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 17 - line 20 * * column 3, line 51; claims 1-19 *; | [A]US5432292 (SLOAN JR EARLE D [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 7, line 13 - line 20; claims 1,49 *; | [A]US5879561 (KLOMP ULFERT CORNELIS [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 29 - line 56 * * column 3, line 17 - line 31; claims 1-18 *; | [A]US2004164278 (DAHLMANN UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* [0022], [0061], Ansprüche 1-12 * |