EP1858837 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 2-(2-AMINOPHENYL)-BICYCLOPROPANE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTER, Harald, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 02 /
CORSI, Camilla, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
EHRENFREUND, Josef, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 04 /
LAMBERTH, Clemens, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 05 /
SCHNEIDER, Hermann Alemannenstrasse 17 79423 Heitersheim / DE | 06 /
TOBLER, Hans, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
WALTER, Harald, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
CORSI, Camilla, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
03 /
EHRENFREUND, Josef, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
04 /
LAMBERTH, Clemens, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
05 /
SCHNEIDER, Hermann Alemannenstrasse 17 79423 Heitersheim / DE | |||
06 /
TOBLER, Hans, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
WALTER, Harald, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
CORSI, Camilla, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
03 /
EHRENFREUND, Josef, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
04 /
LAMBERTH, Clemens, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
05 /
SCHNEIDER, Hermann, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
06 /
TOBLER, Hans, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 CH-4058 Basel / CH | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 06707090.4 | 20.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP01508 | Priority number, date | CH20050000302 | 21.02.2005 Original published format: CH 3022005 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087223 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858837 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858837 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/36 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C07C209/36 (EP,KR,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,US);
C07C303/28 (EP,US);
C07C309/66 (EP,US);
C07C309/67 (EP,US);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/06 (US,EP);
C07C201/12, C07C205/11 (US,EP);
C07C209/36, C07C211/45 (US,EP);
C07C303/28, C07C309/67 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-(2-AMINOPHENYL)BICYCLOPROPANDERIVATEN | [2007/48] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 2-(2-AMINOPHENYL)-BICYCLOPROPANE DERIVATIVES | [2007/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE DERIVES 2-(2-AMINOPHENYL)-BICYCLOPROPANE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2006 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03074491 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-7 * example - *; | [PA]WO2006015865 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [PA] 1-7* page 27 - page 29; example - * |