EP1879594 - USE OF A COMBINATION OF VITAMINS B AND PHYTOSTEROLS FOR LOWERING BLOOD PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DY / GB | |||
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2008/04] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House, Patent Group Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREE, Angelika, de UNILEVER R & D VLAARDINGEN Olivier Van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
PUT, Nathalie Marie Jeanne, van der UNILEVER R & D VLAARDINGEN Olivier Van Noortlaan 120 NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Corsten, Michael Allan, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Corsten, Michael Allan, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2008/04] | Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella, et al Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 06707462.5 | 07.03.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006EP02097 | Priority number, date | EP20050075798 | 07.04.2005 Original published format: EP 05075798 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105838 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1879594 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/585, A61K36/00, A61K31/4415, A61K31/714, A61K31/519, A61P9/12, A23L1/30, A23L1/302 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/525 (EP,US);
A23L33/11 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A61K31/4415 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K31/714 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/525, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/714, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2250/2136, A23V2250/7044, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/706, A23V2250/7056 (EP,US)
(-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINATION AUS VITAMINEN B UND PHYTOSTEROLEN ZUR SENKUNG DES BLUTDRUCKS | [2008/04] | English: | USE OF A COMBINATION OF VITAMINS B AND PHYTOSTEROLS FOR LOWERING BLOOD PRESSURE | [2008/04] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMBINAISON DE VITAMINES B ET PHYTOSTEROLES POUR DIMINUER LA PRESSION ARTERIEUSE | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/23] | 31.01.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR100396211B ; | [Y]WO0057863 (MEDICURE INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1,4 * abstract *; | [Y]US6136349 (KARPPANEN HEIKKI [FI], et al) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2003133965 (BRUNO ROBERTO LUIS [BR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0124] , [0129]; example 1 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 12, Database accession no. 2002-747914, XP002351813 & KR100396211B B1 20030917 (EUGENE SCI INC) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - BAILEY AMELIA PURSER ET AL, "High cholesterol diet induces hypertension, renal damage, and atherosclerosis in LDLR -/- mice", FASEB JOURNAL, & EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY 2005 MEETING/35TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF PHYSIOLOGICAL SCIENCES; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; MARCH 31 -APRIL 06, 2005, (200503), vol. 19, no. 5, Suppl. S, Part 2, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1235, XP009073212 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | [Y] - BORGHI CLAUDIO ET AL, Hypercholesterolemia and progression of high-normal blood pressure to hypertension., EIGHTEENTH ANNUAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HYPERTENSION; NEW YORK, NY, USA; MAY 14-17, 2003, AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HYPERTENSION, VOL. 16, NR. 5 PART 2, PAGE(S) 207A, (200305), ISSN 0895-7061, XP009073211 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * |