EP1846465 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF THERMOPLASTICALLY-PROCESSABLE POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOLZ, Günter Moldestr. 10 49448 Lemförde / DE | 02 /
MOURS, Marian Beethovenstr. 10 67256 Weisenheim / DE | 03 /
LAWRENZ, Sven Donnersbergstr. 17 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
PAPENFUSS, Horst Von-Der-Horst-Weg 25 32351 Stemwede-Haldem / DE | 05 /
BAHR, Christoph Schmiedestr. 152 49459 Lembruch / DE | 06 /
KRECH, Rüdiger Ginsterstr. 1 49356 Diepholz / DE | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Isenbruck, Günter, et al Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06707920.2 | 31.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006EP50550 | Priority number, date | DE20051004967 | 03.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005004967 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082183 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1846465 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846465 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/22, C08G18/66, B29C47/40, B29C49/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/222 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0895 (EP,KR,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/355 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/38 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/405 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/793 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/865 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/875 (EP,US);
B29C49/00 (KR);
C08G18/664 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/6674 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG THERMOPLASTISCH VERARBEITBARER POLYURETHAN-ELASTOMERE | [2007/43] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF THERMOPLASTICALLY-PROCESSABLE POLYURETHANE ELASTOMERS | [2007/43] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE EN CONTINU DES ELASTOMERES DE POLYURETHANNE THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IE | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | LV | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 11.03.2009 | |
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 11.03.2009 | |
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9100304 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 16 ** example 1 *; | [A]DE4437586 (BASF SCHWARZHEIDE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 36 * * example 3; claim 1 *; | [DA]DE19924090 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * page 2, line 35 - line 53 * * example 2 * * page 5, line 27 - line 30 *; | [A] - BARTH U, "KONTINUIERLICHE HERSTELLUNG MASSIVER POLYURETHANPRODUKTE ZWEIWELLIGE ZWEISCHNECKENEXTRUDER", PLASTVERARBEITER, HUETHIG GMBH, HEIDELBERG, DE, (198901), vol. 40, no. 1, ISSN 0032-1338, pages 100 - 102,104,10, XP000080358 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |