EP1984904 - OBSTRUCTION DETECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARD, Matthieu 23, Rue Du Village F-25370 Fourcatier / FR | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 06708027.5 | 06.02.2006 | [2008/44] | WO2006EP50680 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090458 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984904 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984904 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B29/04 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G08B29/26 (EP,US);
G08B29/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HINDERNIS-DETEKTIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2008/44] | English: | OBSTRUCTION DETECTION DEVICE | [2008/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'OBSTRUCTION | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | PL | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | IE | 06.02.2011 | LU | 06.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
TR | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPH11250362 ; | [DA]EP0817148 (ARITECH BV [NL]) [DA] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]US5942976 (WIESER DIETER [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1126430 (OPTEX CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * * claim 1 * * figures 4a,4b *; | [XA]EP1438700 (GE INTERLOGIX B V [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraph [0016] * * column 6, line 13 - line 27 * * paragraph [0020] * [A] 4 | [XAI] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11250362 A 19990917 (OPTEX CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure 7 * [A] 4 [I] 6,7 |