EP1853645 - POLY(ARYL ETHER SULFONE) MATERIAL AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Advanced Polymers, L.L.C. 4500 McGinnis Ferry Road Alpharetta, GA 30005-3914 / US | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINBERG, Shari 3 Brittany Way Atlanta, Fulton, Georgia 30324 / US | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay (Société Anonyme) Intellectual Property Department Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 06708298.2 | 15.02.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006EP50974 | Priority number, date | US20050653137P | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 653137 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087352 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853645 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1853645 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08G75/23 (EP,US);
C08L81/06 (EP,US);
C08J2381/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L81/06, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLY(ARYLETHERSULFON)-MATERIAL UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2007/46] | English: | POLY(ARYL ETHER SULFONE) MATERIAL AND USE THEREOF | [2007/46] | French: | MATIERE DE POLY(ARYL ETHER SULFONE) ET SON UTILISATION | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2006 | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | IT | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8604906 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 1-31* the whole document *; | [X]EP0331492 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US4997902 (KOCH JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0450790 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9115539 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US5110934 (HAY ALLAN S [CA], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US5164466 (EL-HIBRI M J [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US5173542 (LAU ALDRICH N K [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US5916958 (KELLY WILLIAM EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US6228970 (SAVARIAR SELVARAJ [US]) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US6329493 (EL-HIBRI MOHAMMAD J [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002010307 (SCHWAB THOMAS H [US]) [X] 1-31 * the whole document * |