EP1874783 - SUBSTITUTED OXA-DIAZA-SPIRO-[5.5]-UNDECANONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS NEUROKININ ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSENS, Frans Eduard Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
COUPA, Sophie, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Res.& Dev. A div. Janssen-Cilag Campus Maigremont BP 615, F-27106 Val-de-Reuil Cedex / FR | 03 /
PONCELET, A.Ph., Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Res.& Dev. A div. Janssen-Cilag Campus Maigremont BP 615, F-27106 Val-de-Reuil Cédex / FR | 04 /
SCHOENTJES, Bruno Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Res.& Dev. A div. Janssen-Cilag Campus Maigremont BP 615, F-27106 Val-de- Reuil Cédex / FR | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Quaghebeur, Luc Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 06708618.1 | 03.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006EP60419 | Priority number, date | EP20050101657 | 03.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05101657 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006094934 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874783 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874783 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/10, A61K31/537, A61P25/18, A61P25/24 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07D498/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/537 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | 04.10.2007 | BA | 04.10.2007 | HR | 04.10.2007 | MK | 04.10.2007 | YU | 04.10.2007 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE OXADIAZASPIRO-[5.5]-UNDECANONDERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS NEUROKININANTAGONISTEN | [2008/02] | English: | SUBSTITUTED OXA-DIAZA-SPIRO-[5.5]-UNDECANONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS NEUROKININ ANTAGONISTS | [2008/02] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'OXA-DIAZA-SPIRO[5.5]-UNDÉCANONE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DE LA NEUROKININE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9724324 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [YD] 1-19* page 32; table 2 *; | [AD]WO0194346 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [AD] 1-19 * page 1 - page 2 *; | [Y]WO02092604 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-19 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1308439 (WELFIDE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 133; example 129 *; | [A]WO03057698 (ACADIA PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * example - * |